A & A Granite and Limestone, LLC
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Eastern District of Texas (Bankruptcy)

4:2017-bk-41678 (txeb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/22/2018
Operating Report
54
06/13/2018
Dismiss Chapter 11 Case (by Creditor/Trustee/US Trustee)
06/13/2018
Hearing Set - With Form (Text entry; no document attached.)
55
06/15/2018
Certificate of Mailing
07/05/2018
POrder Note (Text entry; no document attached.)
57
07/06/2018
Dismiss Chapter 11 Case (by Creditor/Trustee/US Trustee)
58
07/08/2018
Certificate of Mailing

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.