A A v. County of Riverside et al
Court Docket Sheet

Central District of California

5:2014-cv-02556 (cacd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
183
11/30/2018
Attorney Fees
185
12/28/2018
Order
186
01/14/2019
Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
188
02/11/2019
Order
189
03/11/2019
Response in Support of Motion
190
03/11/2019
Response in Support of Motion
04/05/2019
Text Only Scheduling Notice (Text entry; no document attached.)
192
04/10/2019
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
193
04/22/2019
Objection/Opposition (Motion related)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.