A ABSOLUTE ESCROW SETTLEMENT CO., INC. v. WELLS FARGO BANK, NA et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of New Jersey

2:2018-cv-08911 (njd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
3
05/18/2018
Summons - Request for Issue
4
05/18/2018
Summons Issued
5
06/15/2018
Notice of Appearance
6
06/15/2018
Notice of Appearance
7
06/15/2018
Dismiss
8
06/15/2018
Corporate Disclosure Statement
06/18/2018
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/18/2018
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/18/2018
Notice of Judicial Preferences (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
06/15/2018
Extension of Time to File Answer
11
06/21/2018
Letter
12
06/22/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
13
06/29/2018
Affidavit of Service
14
06/29/2018
Affidavit of Service
15
06/29/2018
Affidavit of Service
16
07/11/2018
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
07/11/2018
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
07/16/2018
Brief in Opposition to Motion
18
07/19/2018
Notice of Appearance
19
07/20/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
20
07/23/2018
Order Set/Reset Hearing on Motion
21
07/23/2018
Response in Support of Motion
07/25/2018
Pretrial Conference - Initial (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
07/26/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
23
07/26/2018
Scheduling Order
24
08/06/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
08/07/2018
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/10/2018
Pro Hac Vice Fee Received (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
08/10/2018
Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF
08/10/2018
Notice of Pro Hac Vice counsel added (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
09/11/2018
Notice of Appearance
29
10/31/2018
Protective Order
31
12/03/2018
Notice to Withdraw from NEF as to Case
32
12/11/2018
Notice of Appearance

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.