A Abriso v. AXYZ Ohio Valley Region, Inc. et al
Court Docket Sheet

Central District of California

8:2018-cv-02121 (cacd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
6
12/03/2018
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
7
12/04/2018
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
9
12/06/2018
Miscellaneous Document
10
01/18/2019
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
11
02/04/2019
Scheduling Conference - optional html form
12
02/04/2019
Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.