A Alexander Silva
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Middle District of Florida (Bankruptcy)

8:2019-bk-01615 (flmb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
02/27/2019
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
02/27/2019
Statement of Social Security Numbers (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
02/27/2019
Certificate Of Credit Counseling
4
02/27/2019
Amended Voluntary Petition
02/28/2019
(NO PAPER) - Alias Removed from Case Style (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
03/01/2019
341 Mtg. Notice - Ch 7 Indiv. No Asset
6
03/01/2019
Notice Of Deficient Filing
7
03/04/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
8
03/04/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest
9
03/13/2019
Statement/Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney
03/14/2019
(NO PAPER) - 521 Compliance Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.