A & Associates, Inc.
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Southern District of Florida (Bankruptcy)

9:2016-bk-23524 (flsb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 110 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/22/2018
Certificate of Service [Attorney
doc
05/23/2018
Order Approving Disclosure Statement
1
10/01/2016
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. [Fee Amount $1717]
2
10/01/2016
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc., d/b/a A & A.
10/01/2016
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(16-23524) [misc,volp11a] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 28391431. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
10/03/2016
Notice of Incomplete Filings Due. List of Equity Security Holders due 10/17/2016. Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 10/17/2016. Schedule A/B due 10/17/2016. Schedule D due 10/17/2016. Schedule E/F due 10/17/2016. Schedule G due 10/17/2016. Schedule H due 10/17/2016.Statement of Financial Affairs Due 10/17/2016.Declaration Concerning Debtors Schedules Due: 10/17/2016. [Incomplete Filings due by 10/17/2016].
4
10/04/2016
Ch 11 Case Management Summary Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.
5
10/04/2016
Certified Payroll/Sales Tax Report and Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.
6
10/05/2016
BNC Certificate of Mailing (Re: 3 Notice of Incomplete Filings Due. List of Equity Security Holders due 10/17/2016. Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 10/17/2016. Schedule A/B due 10/17/2016. Schedule D due 10/17/2016. Schedule E/F due 10/17/2016. Schedule G due 10/17/2016. Schedule H due 10/17/2016.Statement of Financial Affairs Due 10/17/2016.Declaration Concerning Debtors Schedules Due: 10/17/2016. [Incomplete Filings due by 10/17/2016].) Notice Date 10/05/2016.
7
10/13/2016
Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Meeting of Creditors to be Held on 11/21/2016 at 08:30 AM at 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 870, West Palm Beach. Deadline to File a Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts is 1/20/2017. Proofs of Claim due by 2/21/2017.
8
10/15/2016
BNC Certificate of Mailing (Re: 7 Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Meeting of Creditors to be Held on 11/21/2016 at 08:30 AM at 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 870, West Palm Beach. Deadline to File a Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts is 1/20/2017. Proofs of Claim due by 2/21/2017.) Notice Date 10/15/2016.
9
10/16/2016
Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules,Attorney Representation,Corporate Ownership Statement, Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.
10
10/18/2016
Order Granting Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules/Required Information. Deadline Extended through 10/31/2016. (Re: # 9) [Incomplete Filings due by 10/31/2016]. Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 10/31/2016. Schedule A/B due 10/31/2016. Schedule D due 10/31/2016. Schedule E/F due 10/31/2016. Schedule G due 10/31/2016. Schedule H due 10/31/2016. Statement of Financial Affairs Due 10/31/2016. Declaration Concerning Debtors Schedules Due: 10/31/2016. List of Equity Security Holders due 10/31/2016.
11
10/21/2016
Notice of Change of Address for Bright House Networks Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.
12
10/31/2016
Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules,Attorney Representation,Corporate Ownership Statement, Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.
13
11/03/2016
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules/Plan/Required Information. Deadline Extended through 11/7/2016. (Re: # 12) [Incomplete Filings due by 11/7/2016]. Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 11/7/2016. Schedule A/B due 11/7/2016. Schedule D due 11/7/2016. Schedule E/F due 11/7/2016. Schedule G due 11/7/2016. Schedule H due 11/7/2016.Statement of Financial Affairs Due 11/7/2016.Declaration Concerning Debtors Schedules Due: 11/7/2016. List of Equity Security Holders due 11/7/2016.
14
11/07/2016
Initial Schedules Filed: [Summary of Your Assets/Liabilities,Schedule A/B,Schedule D,Schedule E/F,Schedule G,Schedule H,Statement of Financial Affairs,Declaration re Schedules,] Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.
1
Local Form 4
1 Attachment
15
11/07/2016
Equity Security Holders Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.
16
11/28/2016
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for the Period of October 1, 2016 to October 31, 2016 Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.
17
11/28/2016
Amended Schedules Filed: [Summary of Your Assets/Liabilities,Schedule D,Schedule E/F,Statement of Financial Affairs,Declaration re Schedules,] [Fee Amount $30] Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.
1
Local Form 4
1 Attachment
18
11/28/2016
Amended Schedules Filed: [Statement of Financial Affairs,] Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.
19
11/28/2016
List of Twenty Largest Unsecured Creditors Amended Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.
11/28/2016
Receipt of Schedules and Statements Filed(16-23524-PGH) [misc,schsia] (30.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 28752827. Fee amount 30.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
11/28/2016
Amended Schedules Filed: [Summary of Your Assets/Liabilities,Schedule A/B,Declaration re Schedules,] Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.
1
Local Form 4
1 Attachment
21
12/21/2016
Application to Employ Sherri B. Simpson, Esq. as Attorney for Debtor In Possession Nunc Pro Tunc to October 1, 2016 [Affidavit Attached] Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.
1
Affidavit
1 Attachment
22
12/21/2016
Notice of Hearing by Filer (Re: 21 Application to Employ Sherri B. Simpson, Esq. as Attorney for Debtor In Possession Nunc Pro Tunc to October 1, 2016 [Affidavit Attached] Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc. Chapter 11 Hearing scheduled for 01/10/2017 at 10:00 AM at Flagler Waterview Building, 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 801 Courtroom A, West Palm Beach, FL 33401.
23
12/23/2016
Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded. Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the US Trustee. (^UST12, KES)
24
12/23/2016
Until Further Notice, the United States Trustee Will Not Appoint a Committee of Creditors Pursuant to 11 USC Section 1102. Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the US Trustee. (^UST12, KES)
25
12/27/2016
Certificate of Service by Attorney Sherri B. Simpson (Re: 21 Application to Employ Sherri B. Simpson, Esq. as Attorney for Debtor In Possession Nunc Pro Tunc to October 1, 2016 [Affidavit Attached] filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc., 22 Notice of Hearing by Filer filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.).
26
01/05/2017
Certificate of Service (Amended) by Attorney Sherri B. Simpson (Re: 21 Application to Employ Sherri B. Simpson, Esq. as Attorney for Debtor In Possession Nunc Pro Tunc to October 1, 2016 [Affidavit Attached] filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc., 22 Notice of Hearing by Filer filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.).
27
01/10/2017
Notice of Filing Engagement Letter, Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc. (Re: 21 Application to Employ).
28
01/12/2017
Order Granting Application to Employ Sherri B Simpson as Attorney of Debtor (Re: # 21)
29
01/30/2017
Certificate of Service by Attorney Sherri B. Simpson (Re: 28 Order on Application to Employ).
30
01/30/2017
Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney Sherri B. Simpson.
31
01/30/2017
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for the Period of November 1, 2016 to November 30, 2016 Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.
32
01/30/2017
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for the Period of December 1, 2016 to December 31, 2016 Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.
33
02/13/2017
First Interim Application for Compensation for Sherri B. Simpson, Attorney-Debtor, Period: 10/1/2016 to 2/1/2017, Fee: $15,400.00, Expenses: $81.22. Filed by Attorney Sherri B. Simpson.
34
02/13/2017
Notice of Hearing by Filer (Re: 33 First Interim Application for Compensation for Sherri B. Simpson, Attorney-Debtor, Period: 10/1/2016 to 2/1/2017, Fee: $15,400.00, Expenses: $81.22. Filed by Attorney Sherri B. Simpson.). Hearing scheduled for 03/07/2017 at 10:00 AM at Flagler Waterview Building, 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 801 Courtroom A, West Palm Beach, FL 33401.
35
02/14/2017
Certificate of Service by Attorney Sherri B. Simpson (Re: 33 First Interim Application for Compensation for Sherri B. Simpson, Attorney-Debtor, Period: 10/1/2016 to 2/1/2017, Fee: $15,400.00, Expenses: $81.22. filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc., 34 Notice of Hearing by Filer filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.).
36
02/21/2017
Motion for Adequate Protection Filed by Creditor United States of America.
37
02/21/2017
Notice of Hearing by Filer (Re: 36 Motion for Adequate Protection Filed by Creditor United States of America.). Chapter 11 Hearing scheduled for 04/04/2017 at 10:00 AM at Flagler Waterview Building, 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 801 Courtroom A, West Palm Beach, FL 33401.
38
03/07/2017
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for the Period of January 1, 2017 to January 31, 2017 Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.
39
03/13/2017
Order Granting First Interim Application For Compensation (Re: # 33) for Sherri B. Simpson, fees awarded: $12,320.00, expenses awarded: $81.22
40
03/30/2017
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for the Period of February 1, 2017 to February 28, 2017 Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.
41
03/30/2017
Order Denying 36 Motion for Adequate Protection filed by Creditor United States of America ("Movant"). ***Pursuant to Local Rule 9073-1(A), a Notice of Hearing was issued with regard to the Motion, setting a hearing on April 4, 2017. Although the Movant filed a certificate of service with regard to the Motion, the Movant failed to utilize the Courts official mailing matrix. In order for a certificate of service to adequately reflect that it was served on all creditors, the Movant must attach the Courts official mailing matrix to the certificate of service and must indicate that all creditors on the matrix were served. Moreover, the Movant failed entirely to file a certificate of service with regard to the Notice of Hearing. Local Rule 9073-1(B) required the Movant to immediately serve the Notice of Hearing and file, not later than two business days after service of the Notice of Hearing, a certificate of service as required under Local Rule 2002-1(F). Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9006(d) requires that a notice of hearing be served not later than seven (7) days before the time specified for hearing. Because the Movant failed to properly serve both the Motion and the Notice of Hearing, the Motion is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and the hearing scheduled for April 4, 2017, CANCELLED. If counsel who filed the Motion files a new motion requesting the same or substantially similar relief on behalf of the Movant, counsel shall not charge the Movant for any fees or expenses in connection with the preparation or filing of such substitute motion including, without limitation, any filing fee.*** Movant is directed to serve copies of this text-only order upon required parties and file a certificate of service with the court pursuant to Local Rule 2002-1(F). SO ORDERED by Judge Paul G Hyman. (**This is a text-only order with no underlying PDF image entered pursuant to Local Rule 5005-4(F) and Local Rule 9021-1(A)**).
42
03/30/2017
Certificate of Service Filed by Creditor United States of America (Re: 41 Order Denying Relief (TEXT ONLY)).
43
03/30/2017
Amended Motion for Adequate Protection Filed by Creditor United States of America.
44
03/30/2017
Notice of Hearing by Filer (Re: 43 Amended Motion for Adequate Protection Filed by Creditor United States of America.). Chapter 11 Hearing scheduled for 04/18/2017 at 09:30 AM at Flagler Waterview Building, 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 801 Courtroom A, West Palm Beach, FL 33401.
45
03/30/2017
Certificate of Service Filed by Creditor United States of America (Re: 44 Notice of Hearing by Filer filed by Creditor United States of America).
46
04/10/2017
Certificate of Service by Attorney Sherri B. Simpson (Re: 39 Order on Application for Compensation).
47
05/04/2017
Agreed Order Granting Amended Motion For Adequate Protection (Re: # 43)
48
06/29/2017
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for the Period of March 1, 2017 to March 31, 2017 Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.
49
06/29/2017
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for the Period of April 1, 2017 to April 30, 2017 Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.
50
09/06/2017
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for the Period of May 1, 2017 to May 31, 2017 Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.
51
09/06/2017
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for the Period of June 1, 2017 to June 30, 2017 Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.
52
09/06/2017
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for the Period of July 1, 2017 to July 31, 2017 Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.
53
10/23/2017
Motion to Dismiss Case, or in the alternative Motion to Convert Chapter 11 Case to Chapter 7. [Fee Waived] Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the US Trustee.
54
10/24/2017
Notice of Hearing (Re: 53 Motion to Dismiss Case, or in the alternative Motion to Convert Chapter 11 Case to Chapter 7. [Fee Waived] Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the US Trustee.) Chapter 11 Hearing scheduled for 11/17/2017 at 09:30 AM at Flagler Waterview Building, 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 801 Courtroom A, West Palm Beach, FL 33401.
55
10/24/2017
Notice of Transmittal of PDF Document to BNC for Noticing (Re: 53 Motion to Dismiss Case, or in the alternative Motion to Convert Chapter 11 Case to Chapter 7. [Fee Waived] Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the US Trustee.)
56
10/26/2017
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing (Re: 54 Notice of Hearing (Re: 53 Motion to Dismiss Case, or in the alternative Motion to Convert Chapter 11 Case to Chapter 7. [Fee Waived] Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the US Trustee.) Chapter 11 Hearing scheduled for 11/17/2017 at 09:30 AM at Flagler Waterview Building, 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 801 Courtroom A, West Palm Beach, FL 33401.) Notice Date 10/26/2017.
57
10/26/2017
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (Re: 55 Notice of Transmittal of PDF Document to BNC for Noticing (Re: 53 Motion to Dismiss Case, or in the alternative Motion to Convert Chapter 11 Case to Chapter 7. [Fee Waived] Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the US Trustee.)) Notice Date 10/26/2017.
58
11/08/2017
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for the Period of August 1, 2017 to August 31, 2017 Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.
59
11/08/2017
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for the Period of September 1, 2017 to September 30, 2017 Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.
60
11/08/2017
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for the Period of October 1, 2017 to October 31, 2017 Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.
61
11/13/2017
Objection to Claim of Dept. of Revenue - IRS [# 1 (as amended)], Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.
62
11/13/2017
Notice of Hearing by Filer (Re: 61 Objection to Claim of Dept. of Revenue - IRS [# 1 (as amended)], Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.). Chapter 11 Hearing scheduled for 12/05/2017 at 10:00 AM at Flagler Waterview Building, 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 801 Courtroom A, West Palm Beach, FL 33401.
63
11/13/2017
Certificate of Service by Attorney Sherri B. Simpson (Re: 61 Objection to Claim of Dept. of Revenue - IRS [# 1 (as amended)], filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc., 62 Notice of Hearing by Filer filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.).
64
11/17/2017
Notice of Continued Hearing (Re: 53 Motion to Dismiss Case, or in the alternative Motion to Convert Chapter 11 Case to Chapter 7. [Fee Waived] Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the US Trustee.) Chapter 11 Hearing scheduled for 12/05/2017 at 10:00 AM at Flagler Waterview Building, 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 801 Courtroom A, West Palm Beach, FL 33401.
65
11/19/2017
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing (Re: 64 Notice of Continued Hearing (Re: 53 Motion to Dismiss Case, or in the alternative Motion to Convert Chapter 11 Case to Chapter 7. [Fee Waived] Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the US Trustee.) Chapter 11 Hearing scheduled for 12/05/2017 at 10:00 AM at Flagler Waterview Building, 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 801 Courtroom A, West Palm Beach, FL 33401.) Notice Date 11/19/2017.
66
11/20/2017
Certificate of Service by Attorney Sherri B. Simpson (Re: 61 Objection to Claim of Dept. of Revenue - IRS [# 1 (as amended)], filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc., 62 Notice of Hearing by Filer filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.).
67
12/04/2017
Amended Objection to Claim of Dept. of Revenue-IRS [# 1], Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.
68
12/04/2017
Notice of Hearing by Filer (Re: 67 Amended Objection to Claim of Dept. of Revenue-IRS [# 1], Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.). Chapter 11 Hearing scheduled for 12/19/2017 at 09:30 AM at Flagler Waterview Building, 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 801 Courtroom A, West Palm Beach, FL 33401.
69
12/04/2017
Certificate of Service by Attorney Sherri B. Simpson (Re: 67 Amended Objection to Claim of Dept. of Revenue-IRS [# 1], filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc., 68 Notice of Hearing by Filer filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.).
70
12/06/2017
Notice to Withdraw Document Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc. (Re: 67 Objection to Claim).
71
12/07/2017
Order Denying United States Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Or Convert And Setting A Deadline By Which Debtor Must File A Disclosure Statement And Plan Of Reorganization (Re: # 53)
72
12/09/2017
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (Re: 71 Order Denying United States Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Or Convert And Setting A Deadline By Which Debtor Must File A Disclosure Statement And Plan Of Reorganization (Re: 53)) Notice Date 12/09/2017.
73
01/05/2018
Chapter 11 Plan Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.
74
01/05/2018
Disclosure Statement Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.
75
01/17/2018
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for the Period of 11/1/2017 to 11/30/2017 Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.
76
01/17/2018
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for the Period of 12/1/2017 to 12/31/2017 Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.
77
01/25/2018
Order (I) Setting Hearing on 03/07/2018 at 09:30 AM in Flagler Waterview Building, 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 801 Courtroom A, West Palm Beach, FL 33401 to Consider Approval of Disclosure Statement; (II) Setting Deadline for Filing Objections to Disclosure Statement; and (III) Directing Plan Proponent to Service Notice (Re: 74 Disclosure Statement filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.). Hearing on Disclosure Statement to be Held on 03/07/2018 at 09:30 AM at Flagler Waterview Building, 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 801 Courtroom A, West Palm Beach, FL 33401. Objection to Disclosure Statement Deadline: 2/28/2018.
78
02/06/2018
Certificate of Service by Attorney Sherri B. Simpson (Re: 73 Chapter 11 Plan filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc., 74 Disclosure Statement filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc., 77 Order Setting Hearing on Approval of Disclosure Statement).
79
02/14/2018
Objection to (74 Disclosure Statement filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.) Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the US Trustee
80
02/26/2018
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for the Period of January 1, 2018 to January 31, 2018 Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.
81
02/27/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Craig I Kelley Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.
82
02/27/2018
Agreed Motion To Substitute Attorney Craig I. Kelley, Esq for Attorney Sherri B. Simpson, Esq. Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.
1
Stipulation of Substitution of Counsel
1 Attachment
83
02/27/2018
Certificate of Service by Attorney Craig I Kelley (Re: 82 Agreed Motion To Substitute Attorney Craig I. Kelley, Esq for Attorney Sherri B. Simpson, Esq. filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.).
84
02/27/2018
Motion to Continue Hearing On: [(74 Disclosure Statement)] Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.
85
02/28/2018
Agreed Order Granting Agreed Ex Parte Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Craig I. Kelley Substituted for Attorney Sherri B. Simpson as Counsel. (Re: # 82)
86
02/28/2018
Certificate of Service by Attorney Craig I Kelley (Re: 85 Order on Motion To Substitute Attorney).
87
03/01/2018
Notice of Hearing (Re: 84 Motion to Continue Hearing On: [(74 Disclosure Statement)] Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.) Chapter 11 Hearing scheduled for 03/07/2018 at 09:30 AM at Flagler Waterview Building, 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 801 Courtroom A, West Palm Beach, FL 33401.
88
03/01/2018
Certificate of Service by Attorney Craig I Kelley (Re: 87 Notice of Hearing).
89
03/06/2018
Application to Employ Craig I. Kelley, Esq and Kelley and Fulton, P.L. as General Counsel for Debtor [Affidavit Attached] Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.
1
Affidavit
1 Attachment
90
03/06/2018
Notice of Hearing by Filer (Re: 89 Application to Employ Craig I. Kelley, Esq and Kelley and Fulton, P.L. as General Counsel for Debtor [Affidavit Attached] Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc. Chapter 11 Hearing scheduled for 04/03/2018 at 10:00 AM at Flagler Waterview Building, 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 801 Courtroom A, West Palm Beach, FL 33401.
91
03/06/2018
Certificate of Service by Attorney Craig I Kelley (Re: 89 Application to Employ Craig I. Kelley, Esq and Kelley and Fulton, P.L. as General Counsel for Debtor [Affidavit Attached] filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc., 90 Notice of Hearing by Filer filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.).
92
03/06/2018
Notice of Filing Retainer Agreement, Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc. (Re: 89 Application to Employ).
1
Retainer Agreement
1 Attachment
93
03/08/2018
Re- Notice of Hearing (Re: 89 Application to Employ Craig I. Kelley, Esq and Kelley and Fulton, P.L. as General Counsel for Debtor [Affidavit Attached] Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc. Chapter 11 Hearing scheduled for 03/16/2018 at 09:30 AM at Flagler Waterview Building, 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 801 Courtroom A, West Palm Beach, FL 33401.
94
03/08/2018
Certificate of Service by Attorney Craig I Kelley (Re: 93 Notice of Hearing Amended/Renoticed/Continued).
95
03/13/2018
Order Continuing Hearing to Consider Disclosure Statement Re: (74 Disclosure Statement). Chapter 11 Hearing scheduled for 04/24/2018 at 01:30 PM at Flagler Waterview Building, 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 801 Courtroom A, West Palm Beach, FL 33401.
96
03/14/2018
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc. (Re: 95 Order on Motion to Continue Hearing).
97
03/21/2018
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for the Period of February 1, 2018 to February 28, 2018 Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.
98
03/23/2018
Final Order Granting Application to Employ Craig I. Kelley (Re: # 89)
99
03/27/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Annika M Miranda Filed by Creditor United States of America, IRS.
100
04/05/2018
Amended Disclosure Statement (Related Document(s):74 Disclosure Statement filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.) Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.
1
Exhibit "A" List of Claims #
2
Exhibit "B: Liquidation Analysis #
3
Exhibit "C" Schedule A/B #
4
Exhibit "D" Monthly Operating Reports #
5
Exhibit "E" Projections
5 Attachments
101
04/05/2018
Amended Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization (Related Document(s):73 Chapter 11 Plan filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.) Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.
102
04/06/2018
Objection to Claim of Department of Treasury - Internal Revenue Service [# 1-8], [Negative Notice] Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.
103
04/06/2018
Certificate of Service by Attorney Craig I Kelley (Re: 100 Amended Disclosure Statement filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc., 101 Amended Chapter 11 Plan filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.).
104
04/06/2018
Objection to (100 Amended Disclosure Statement filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.) Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the US Trustee
105
04/14/2018
In accordance with General Order 2018-01, this case is transferred from Judge Paul G. Hyman, Jr. to Judge Mindy A. Mora.
106
04/27/2018
Order Continuing Hearing On (Re: 100 Amended Disclosure Statement filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.). Chapter 11 Hearing scheduled for 05/22/2018 at 01:30 PM at Flagler Waterview Building, 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 801 Courtroom A, West Palm Beach, FL 33401.
107
05/01/2018
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc. (Re: 106 Order Continuing Hearing).
108
05/07/2018
Objection to Scheduled Claim of AMSCOT CORPORATION in the Amount of 4,100.00 [Negative Notice] Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.
109
05/07/2018
Objection to Scheduled Claim of BRIGHT HOUSE NETWORKS in the Amount of 300.00 [Negative Notice] Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.
110
05/07/2018
Objection to Scheduled Claim of DELTACOM EARTHLINK BUSINESS SOLUTIONS in the Amount of $7,000.00 [Negative Notice] Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.
111
05/07/2018
Objection to Claim of EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY [# 3], [Negative Notice] Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.
112
05/07/2018
Objection to Scheduled Claim of IRA ZUCKERMAN, P.A. in the Amount of $3,000.00 [Negative Notice] Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.
113
05/07/2018
Objection to Scheduled Claim of MONSTER WORLDWIDE, INC. in the Amount of $1,500.00 [Negative Notice] Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.
114
05/07/2018
Objection to Scheduled Claim of NEW YORK DEPARTMENT OF STATE DIVISION OF CORPORATIONS in the Amount of $500.00 [Negative Notice] Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.
115
05/07/2018
Objection to Scheduled Claim of NEW YORK DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION in the Amount of $2,000.00 [Negative Notice] Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.
116
05/07/2018
Objection to Scheduled Claim of PLANNED ADMINISTRATORS, INC. in the Amount of $500.00 [Negative Notice] Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.
117
05/07/2018
Objection to Scheduled Claim of PUBLIX CORPORATE OFFICE in the Amount of $500.00 [Negative Notice] Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.
118
05/07/2018
Objection to Scheduled Claim of THE CREXENT, LLC in the Amount of Unknown [Negative Notice] Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.
119
05/07/2018
Response to (102 Objection to Claim of Department of Treasury - Internal Revenue Service [# 1-8], [Negative Notice] filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.) Filed by Creditor United States of America, IRS
120
05/17/2018
Certificate of Contested Matter Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc. (Re: 102 Objection to Claim of Department of Treasury - Internal Revenue Service [# 1-8], [Negative Notice] filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc., 119 Response filed by Creditor United States of America, IRS).
121
05/17/2018
Objection to Scheduled Claim of Florida Department of Revenue in the Amount of $79,724.06 [Negative Notice] Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.
122
05/17/2018
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for the Period of March 1, 2018 to March 31, 2018 Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.
123
05/17/2018
Response to (120 Certificate of Contested Matter filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.) Filed by Creditor United States of America, IRS
124
05/18/2018
Notice of Hearing (Re: 102 Objection to Claim of Department of Treasury - Internal Revenue Service [# 1-8], [Negative Notice] Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc., 119 Response to (102 Objection to Claim of Department of Treasury - Internal Revenue Service [# 1-8], [Negative Notice] filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.) Filed by Creditor United States of America, IRS) Chapter 11 Hearing scheduled for 05/22/2018 at 01:30 PM at Flagler Waterview Building, 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 801 Courtroom A, West Palm Beach, FL 33401.
125
05/18/2018
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for the Period of April 1, 2018 to April 30, 2018 Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.
126
05/18/2018
Second Amended Disclosure Statement (Related Document(s):100 Amended Disclosure Statement filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.) Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.
127
05/18/2018
Second Amended Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization (Related Document(s):101 Amended Chapter 11 Plan filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.) Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.
128
05/18/2018
Notice of Filing, Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc. (Re: 126 Amended Disclosure Statement).
1
Exhibit "A" List of Claims #
2
Exhibit "B" Liquidation Analysis #
3
Exhibit "C" Schedule A/B #
4
Exhibit "D: Monthly Operating Reports #
5
Exhibit "E" Projections
5 Attachments
129
05/18/2018
Certificate of Service by Attorney Craig I Kelley (Re: 126 Amended Disclosure Statement filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc., 127 Amended Chapter 11 Plan filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc., 128 Notice of Filing filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.).
130
05/21/2018
Notice of Filing Amended Five Year Projections, Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc. (Re: 126 Amended Disclosure Statement, 128 Notice of Filing).
1
Exhibit Amended Five Year Projections - Exhibit "A" to Disclosure Statement
1 Attachment
131
05/22/2018
Certificate of Service by Attorney Craig I Kelley (Re: 124 Notice of Hearing).
132
05/23/2018
Notice of Continued Hearing (Re: 102 Objection to Claim of Department of Treasury - Internal Revenue Service [# 1-8], [Negative Notice] Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc., 119 Response to (102 Objection to Claim of Department of Treasury - Internal Revenue Service [# 1-8], [Negative Notice] filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.) Filed by Creditor United States of America, IRS) Chapter 11 Hearing scheduled for 07/17/2018 at 01:30 PM at Flagler Waterview Building, 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 801 Courtroom A, West Palm Beach, FL 33401.
133
05/23/2018
Order Approving Disclosure Statement and Setting Hearing on Confirmation of Plan (Re: 127 Amended Chapter 11 Plan filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.). Confirmation Hearing to be Held on 07/17/2018 at 01:30 PM at Flagler Waterview Building, 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 801 Courtroom A, West Palm Beach, FL 33401. Deadline for Service of this Order, Disclosure Statement, Plan, and Ballot: 6/7/2018. Objection to Claims Deadline: 6/7/2018. Fee Applications Due: 6/26/2018. Deadline for Service of Fee Applications: 7/3/2018. Objection to Confirmation Deadline: 7/3/2018.Deadline for Filing of Ballots: 7/3/2018. Deadline for Filing Report of Proponent and Confirmation Affidavit: 7/12/2018.
doc
05/25/2018
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc. (Re: 132 Notice of Hearing Amended/Renoticed/Continued).
135
05/25/2018
Certificate of Service by Attorney Craig I Kelley (Re: 126 Amended Disclosure Statement filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc., 127 Amended Chapter 11 Plan filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc., 130 Notice of Filing filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc., 133 Order Approving Disclosure Statement).
136
05/25/2018
Certificate of Service (Amended) by Attorney Craig I Kelley (Re: 126 Amended Disclosure Statement filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc., 127 Amended Chapter 11 Plan filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc., 130 Notice of Filing filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc., 133 Order Approving Disclosure Statement).
137
06/05/2018
Final Application for Compensation for Craig I Kelley, Attorney-Debtor, Period: 2/26/2018 to 5/31/2018, Fee: $25,755.00, Expenses: $240.36. Filed by Attorney Craig I Kelley.
1
Exhibit Invoice
1 Attachment
138
06/05/2018
Notice of Hearing by Filer (Re: 137 Final Application for Compensation for Craig I Kelley, Attorney-Debtor, Period: 2/26/2018 to 5/31/2018, Fee: $25,755.00, Expenses: $240.36. Filed by Attorney Craig I Kelley. Hearing scheduled for 06/26/2018 at 10:00 AM at Flagler Waterview Building, 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 801 Courtroom A, West Palm Beach, FL 33401.
139
06/06/2018
Amended Notice of Hearing (Re: 137 Final Application for Compensation for Craig I Kelley, Attorney-Debtor, Period: 2/26/2018 to 5/31/2018, Fee: $25,755.00, Expenses: $240.36. Filed by Attorney Craig I Kelley. Chapter 11 Hearing scheduled for 06/26/2018 at 01:30 PM at Flagler Waterview Building, 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 801 Courtroom A, West Palm Beach, FL 33401.
140
06/08/2018
Certificate of Service by Attorney Craig I Kelley (Re: 138 Notice of Hearing by Filer filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc., 139 Notice of Hearing Amended/Renoticed/Continued).
141
06/27/2018
Re- Notice of Hearing (Re: 137 Final Application for Compensation for Craig I Kelley, Attorney-Debtor, Period: 2/26/2018 to 5/31/2018, Fee: $25,755.00, Expenses: $240.36. Filed by Attorney Craig I Kelley. Chapter 11 Hearing scheduled for 07/17/2018 at 01:30 PM at Flagler Waterview Building, 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 801 Courtroom A, West Palm Beach, FL 33401.
142
06/27/2018
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc. (Re: 139 Notice of Hearing Amended/Renoticed/Continued, 141 Notice of Hearing Amended/Renoticed/Continued).
143
07/02/2018
Order Sustaining Objection to Scheduled Claim(s) of Monster Worldwide, Inc. (Re: # 113)
144
07/02/2018
Order Sustaining Objection to Scheduled Claim(s) of New York Department of State Division of Corporations (Re: # 114)
145
07/02/2018
Order Sustaining Objection to Scheduled Claim(s) of Ira Zuckerman, PA (Re: # 112)
146
07/02/2018
Order Sustaining Objection to Scheduled Claim(s) of Everest National Insurance Company (Re: # 111)
147
07/02/2018
Order Sustaining Objection to Scheduled Claim(s) of Deltacom EarthLink Business Solutions (Re: # 110)
148
07/02/2018
Order Sustaining Objection to Scheduled Claim(s) of Bright House Networks (Re: # 109)
149
07/02/2018
Order Sustaining Objection to Scheduled Claim(s) of Amscot Corporation (Re: # 108)
150
07/02/2018
Order Sustaining Objection to Scheduled Claim(s) of Florida Department of Revenue (Re: # 121)
151
07/02/2018
Order Sustaining Objection to Scheduled Claim(s) of New York Department of Taxation (Re: # 115)
152
07/02/2018
Order Sustaining Objection to Scheduled Claim(s) of Planned Administrators, Inc. (Re: # 116)
153
07/02/2018
Order Sustaining Objection to Scheduled Claim(s) of Publix Corporate Office (Re: # 117)
154
07/02/2018
Order Sustaining Objection to Scheduled Claim(s) of Crexent (Re: # 118)
155
07/02/2018
Notice of Unavailability from 07/11/18 to 7/18/18 by Attorney Craig I Kelley.
156
07/02/2018
Chapter 11 Ballot ACCEPTING Plan. (Class in Plan: 3; Amount: 25,291.75) Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.
157
07/02/2018
Chapter 11 Ballot ACCEPTING Plan. (Class in Plan: n/a; Amount: 25,291.75) by Creditor Theodore Miloch, PA Filed by Theodore Miloch, PA
158
07/02/2018
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc. (Re: 143 Order on Objection to Claims).
159
07/02/2018
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc. (Re: 144 Order on Objection to Claims).
160
07/03/2018
Certificate of Service Amended Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc. (Re: 158 Certificate of Service filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.).
161
07/03/2018
Certificate of Service Amended Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc. (Re: 159 Certificate of Service filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.).
162
07/03/2018
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc. (Re: 145 Order on Objection to Claims).
163
07/03/2018
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc. (Re: 146 Order on Objection to Claims).
164
07/03/2018
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc. (Re: 147 Order on Objection to Claims).
165
07/03/2018
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc. (Re: 148 Order on Objection to Claims).
166
07/03/2018
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc. (Re: 149 Order on Objection to Claims).
167
07/03/2018
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc. (Re: 150 Order on Objection to Claims).
168
07/03/2018
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc. (Re: 151 Order on Objection to Claims).
169
07/03/2018
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc. (Re: 152 Order on Objection to Claims).
170
07/03/2018
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc. (Re: 153 Order on Objection to Claims).
171
07/03/2018
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc. (Re: 154 Order on Objection to Claims).
172
07/03/2018
Objection to Confirmation of (127 Amended Chapter 11 Plan filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.) Filed by Creditor United States of America, IRS
173
07/13/2018
Certificate on Acceptance of Plan and Tabulation of Ballots Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.
1
Exhibit "A" Summary of Ballots #
2
Exhibit "B" Ballot Tabulation #
3
Exhibit "C" List of Creditors Paid Through Plan #
4
Exhibit "D" List of Objections to Claims
4 Attachments
174
07/13/2018
Affidavit of Andrew Luchey in Support of Confirmation of the Second Amended Chapter 11 Plan Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc. (Re: 127 Amended Chapter 11 Plan filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.).
175
07/15/2018
Supplemental Application for Compensation for Craig I Kelley, Attorney-Debtor, Period: 6/1/2018 to 7/14/2018, Fee: $11,262.50, Expenses: $0.00. Filed by Attorney Craig I Kelley.
1
Exhibit Invoice
1 Attachment
176
07/20/2018
Order Granting Applications For Final Compensation (Re: # 137 and Supplemental Application Re: # 175) for Craig I Kelley, fees awarded: $37,017.50, expenses awarded: $240.36
177
07/20/2018
Order Confirming Second Amended Chapter 11 Plan. (Re: 127 Amended Chapter 11 Plan filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc). Post Confirmation Status Conference to be held on 09/04/2018 at 01:30 PM at Flagler Waterview Building, 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 801 Courtroom A, West Palm Beach, FL 33401.
178
07/23/2018
Certificate of Service by Attorney Craig I Kelley (Re: 176 Order on Application for Compensation).
179
07/23/2018
Certificate of Service by Attorney Craig I Kelley (Re: 177 Order Confirming Chapter 11 Plan).
180
08/08/2018
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for the Period of June 1, 2018 to June 30, 2018 Filed by Debtor A & Associates, Inc.
1 Attachment
1 Attachment

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.