A & B Associates, L.P.
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Southern District of Georgia (Bankruptcy)

4:2017-bk-40185 (gasb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/24/2018
Compensation (order)
doc
05/24/2018
Compensation (order)
doc
05/30/2018
Compensation (order)
doc
05/30/2018
Compensation (order)
462
07/19/2018
Requiring Service
471
07/27/2018
Extend Exclusivity Period (order)
472
07/27/2018
Requiring Service
490
09/13/2018
Relief from Stay (Order)
505
09/25/2018
Requiring Service
509
09/26/2018
Opinion
510
09/26/2018
Order (Generic)
516
09/27/2018
Employ (order)
517
09/27/2018
Requiring Service
521
09/28/2018
Examination (order)
551
11/01/2018
Requiring Service
553
11/01/2018
Requiring Service

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.