A & B Auto Body Supply, Inc. v. Chiras
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Central District of Illinois (Bankruptcy)

1:2018-ap-08021 (ilcb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 26 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
06/27/2018
Adversary case 18-08021. (41 Objection/revocation of discharge - 727)(65 (Dischargeability - other)): Complaint by A & B Auto Body Supply, Inc., A & B Auto Body Supply, Inc. against Michael P. Chiras Modified on 6/27/2018
1
Proposed Summons
1 Attachment
06/27/2018
Receipt of Complaint(18-08021) [cmp,cmp] (350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 10874796. Fee amount 350.00 (re: Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/27/2018
Corrective Entry - Removed duplicate plaintiff in ECF to match complaint. (RE: related document(s) 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff A & B Auto Body Supply, Inc.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
06/27/2018
Adversary Deficiency Notice Re: Disclosure of Corporate Ownership Deficiency Due: 7/11/2018.
3
06/27/2018
Summons Issued on Michael P. Chiras Answer Due 7/27/2018
4
06/28/2018
Disclosure of Corporate Ownership Statement. Filed by Jonathan Lucas Alle Phillips of Shay Phillips, Ltd. on behalf of A & B Auto Body Supply, Inc.
5
06/29/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 2 Adversary Deficiency Notice) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/29/2018.
6
06/29/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 3 Summons Issued) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/29/2018.
7
07/10/2018
Summons Service Executed on Michael P. Chiras 7/2/2018
8
07/31/2018
Adversary Deficiency Notice - Deficiency Due: 8/14/2018.
9
07/31/2018
Correspondence Filed by Jonathan Lucas Alle Phillips of Shay Phillips, Ltd. on behalf of A & B Auto Body Supply, Inc.
1
Proposed Alias Summons
1 Attachment
10
07/31/2018
Alias Summons Issued on Michael P. Chiras Answer Due 8/30/2018
11
08/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 8 Adversary Deficiency Notice) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/02/2018.
12
08/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 10 Alias Summons Issued) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/02/2018.
13
08/06/2018
Summons Service Executed on Michael P. Chiras 8/3/2018
14
09/07/2018
Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Jonathan Lucas Alle Phillips of Shay Phillips, Ltd. on behalf of A & B Auto Body Supply, Inc.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
15
09/07/2018
Adversary Deficiency Notice Re: Motion for Default Deficiency Due: 9/21/2018.
16
09/07/2018
Hearing Set (RE: related document(s) 14 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff A & B Auto Body Supply, Inc.) Hearing to be held on 10/1/2018 at 09:00 AM (p) Courtroom 121, Peoria, IL for 14
17
09/09/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 15 Adversary Deficiency Notice) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/09/2018.
18
09/09/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing (RE: related document(s) 16 Hearing (Adv Motion) Set) No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 09/09/2018.
19
09/11/2018
Certificate of Service indicating service to all of Mr. Chiras' known addresses Filed by Jonathan Lucas Alle Phillips of Shay Phillips, Ltd. on behalf of A & B Auto Body Supply, Inc. (RE: related document(s) 14 Motion for Default Judgment).
20
10/01/2018
Hearing Held (RE: related document(s) 14 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff A & B Auto Body Supply, Inc.)
21
10/01/2018
Oral Notice of Continued Hearing (RE: related document(s) 14 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff A & B Auto Body Supply, Inc.) Status hearing to be held on 11/19/2018 at 09:00 AM at (p) Courtroom 121, Peoria, IL.
22
11/19/2018
Hearing Held (RE: related document(s) 14 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff A & B Auto Body Supply, Inc.)
23
11/19/2018
Oral Notice of Continued Hearing (RE: related document(s) 14 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff A & B Auto Body Supply, Inc.) Status hearing to be held on 1/7/2019 at 09:00 AM at (p) Courtroom 121, Peoria, IL.
24
01/04/2019
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Spencer Lee Daniels on behalf of Michael P. Chiras.
25
01/07/2019
Notice of Change of Address for Jonathan LA Phillips, ATY, 230 SW Adams, Ste. 310, Peoria, IL 61602. New address changed to: Jonathan LA Phillips, Attorney at Law, P.O. Box 6323, Peoria, IL 61601-6323 Filed by Jonathan Lucas Allen Phillips of Attorney at Law on behalf of A & B Auto Body Supply, Inc.
26
01/07/2019
Hearing Held (RE: related document(s) 14 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff A & B Auto Body Supply, Inc.) Hearing held deadline set: Order due 1/21/2019.
27
01/22/2019
Answer to Complaint Filed by Spencer Lee Daniels on behalf of Michael P. Chiras (RE: related document(s) 1 Adversary case 18-08021. (41 Objection/revocation of discharge - 727)(65 (Dischargeability - other)): Complaint by A & B Auto Body Supply, Inc., A & B Auto Body Supply, Inc. against Michael P. Chiras.
28
01/23/2019
Pre-Trial Adversary Hearing Notice and PreTrial Order (RE: related document(s) 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff A & B Auto Body Supply, Inc.). Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/19/2019 at 03:15 PM at (p) Courtroom 121, Peoria, IL.
29
01/24/2019
Order Denying Motion For Default Judgment (Related Doc # 14)
30
01/25/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing (RE: related document(s) 28 Pre-Trial Adversary Hearing Notice and Order) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/25/2019.
31
01/26/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related document(s) 29 Order on Motion for Default Judgment) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/26/2019.

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.