A B Cernelle v. Graminex L L C, et al
Court Docket Sheet

Eastern District of Michigan

2:2003-cv-10291 (mied)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
87
08/24/2018
Appearance
88
08/24/2018
Appearance
89
08/24/2018
Contempt
91
08/28/2018
Appearance
92
08/30/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
94
09/25/2018
Appearance
95
09/25/2018
File Excess Pages
96
09/26/2018
Response to Motion
100
10/05/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
101
10/08/2018
Motion - Free
102
10/08/2018
Hearing on Motion*
103
10/09/2018
Strike
106
10/19/2018
For Order
107
10/19/2018
Notice - Other
108
10/19/2018
Motion - Free
109
10/26/2018
Hearing on Motion*
110
11/02/2018
Response to Motion
111
11/02/2018
Response to Motion
11/08/2018
Text-Only Notice of Hearing Cancelled (Text entry; no document attached.)
115
11/13/2018
Order
116
12/04/2018
Motion - Free
118
12/10/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
120
12/13/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
121
12/14/2018
Hearing on Motion*
123
12/19/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
124
01/03/2019
Response to Motion
126
01/09/2019
Reply to Response to Motion
127
01/14/2019
Appearance
129
01/15/2019
Strike
130
01/15/2019
Order on Motion - Free
132
01/23/2019
Compel
133
01/24/2019
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
134
01/25/2019
Response to Motion
135
01/25/2019
Reply to Response to Motion
136
01/28/2019
Protective Order
137
01/29/2019
Protective Order
139
01/30/2019
Hearing on Motion*
140
01/30/2019
Compel
141
01/30/2019
Response to Motion
142
01/31/2019
Reply to Response to Motion
143
01/31/2019
Withdrawal of Attorney
02/01/2019
Appear* (Text entry; no document attached.)
145
02/01/2019
Appear*
146
02/06/2019
Appearance
147
02/06/2019
Response to Motion
148
02/07/2019
Order
149
02/08/2019
Hearing on Motion*
150
02/11/2019
Order
151
02/11/2019
Appearance
152
02/12/2019
Response to Motion
154
02/14/2019
Order
155
02/15/2019
Strike
157
02/27/2019
Order
159
02/28/2019
Motion - Free
160
03/01/2019
Order
161
03/05/2019
Protective Order
162
03/06/2019
Response to Motion
164
03/06/2019
Notice - Other
165
03/07/2019
Withdrawal of Attorney
166
03/07/2019
Order
167
03/08/2019
Order on Motion - Free
168
03/14/2019
Order
169
03/18/2019
Notice - Other
173
03/20/2019
Notice - Other
174
03/21/2019
Compel
175
03/21/2019
Order
176
03/21/2019
Requiring Responsive Pleading*
177
03/22/2019
Motion - Free
178
03/25/2019
Requiring Responsive Pleading*
179
03/25/2019
Response to Motion
182
03/27/2019
Response to Motion
183
03/27/2019
Reply to Response to Motion
184
03/27/2019
Supplemental Brief
185
03/28/2019
Reply to Response to Motion
186
03/28/2019
Supplemental Brief
187
03/29/2019
Order on Motion to Compel
188
03/29/2019
Order on Motion - Free
189
04/02/2019
Compel
190
04/03/2019
Withdraw
191
04/03/2019
Withdraw Motion
193
04/04/2019
Appearance
194
04/05/2019
Withdrawal of Attorney
195
04/05/2019
Seal
196
04/07/2019
In Limine
197
04/08/2019
Hearing on Motion*
198
04/11/2019
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
199
04/15/2019
Order
201
04/18/2019
For Order
04/19/2019
Text-Only Notice of Hearing Cancelled (Text entry; no document attached.)
202
04/19/2019
Response to Motion
203
04/19/2019
Response to Motion
204
04/22/2019
Order on Motion for Order
206
04/22/2019
Notice - Other
207
04/22/2019
Strike
209
04/23/2019
Order on Motion to Strike

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.