A B F4 Ventures Cinnaholic
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Eastern District of Texas (Bankruptcy)

4:2018-bk-41837 (txeb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/20/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
2
08/20/2018
Notice of Appearance
10
08/23/2018
Emergency Hearing
14
08/23/2018
Notice of Hearing
08/29/2018
Designation of Chapter 11 Case as Small Business (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
09/01/2018
Certificate of Mailing
26
09/15/2018
Certificate of Mailing
29
09/19/2018
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
10/10/2018
POrder Note (Text entry; no document attached.)
33
10/12/2018
Employ
34
10/13/2018
Certificate of Mailing
35
10/14/2018
Certificate of Mailing
37
10/22/2018
Approval of Chapter 11 Agreed Scheduling Order (by US TRUSTEE ONLY)
38
10/22/2018
Operating Report
39
10/22/2018
Operating Report
40
10/22/2018
Certificate of Notice
41
10/23/2018
Certificate of Notice
42
11/16/2018
Order on Motion for the Approval of Chapter 11 Agreed Scheduling Order
43
11/18/2018
Certificate of Mailing

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.