A&B Imports, Inc.
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Western District of Washington (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-12104 (wawb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/25/2018
Involuntary Petition (Chapter 7)
05/25/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
1
05/25/2018
Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Petition of A and b Imports inc
6
06/28/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
7
06/30/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
14
09/28/2018
2004 Examination
15
09/28/2018
2004 Examination
16
09/28/2018
Declaration
17
09/28/2018
Received UNSIGNED Order
18
09/28/2018
Received UNSIGNED Order
32
01/14/2019
2004 Examination
33
01/14/2019
Received UNSIGNED Order
34
01/16/2019
2004 Examination (order)
38
04/06/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
40
04/22/2019
Declaration of No Objection (pdf uploaded)
41
04/22/2019
Received UNSIGNED Order
42
04/24/2019
Dismissing Case (order)
43
04/24/2019
Notice of Dismissal
44
04/26/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
45
04/26/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
05/16/2019
Close Chapter 7 Case & Approve Trustee's Report of No Distribution (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.