A&B Industries of Morgan City, Inc.
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Western District of Louisiana (Bankruptcy)

4:2017-bk-51452 (lawb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
11/07/2017
Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Petition of A&B Industries of Morgan City, Inc.
73
09/01/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
77
11/14/2018
Hearing Notice, IF AND ONLY IF Objections Served
83
12/17/2018
Certificate of Service
84
12/19/2018
Continue Hearing
85
12/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
86
01/02/2019
Opposition Brief/Memorandum
87
01/03/2019
Objection
91
01/23/2019
Objection to Claim (Granted)
92
01/23/2019
Compensation/Administrative Expenses, TRUSTEE related ONLY
94
01/26/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
95
01/31/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.