A & B Mart & Service, Inc.
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Eastern District of New York (Bankruptcy)

8:2015-bk-70118 (nyeb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
158
12/10/2018
Stipulation and Order
159
12/10/2018
Stipulation and Order
12/20/2018
Statement Adjourning 341(a) Meeting of Creditors (Text entry; no document attached.)
160
12/28/2018
Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019
161
01/16/2019
Letter
162
01/29/2019
Object/Reclassify/Reduce/Expunge Claims
02/04/2019
Chapter 7 Trustee's Request For Special Charges (Text entry; no document attached.)
163
02/06/2019
Statement of Clerk's Cost with Notice
03/06/2019
Statement Adjourning 341(a) Meeting of Creditors (Text entry; no document attached.)
164
04/09/2019
~Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Report (TFR) (Effective 12/9/2013)
165
04/09/2019
Compensation (Application)
166
04/10/2019
Compensation (Application)
167
04/10/2019
Compensation (Application)
04/10/2019
~UST Statement of No Objection Re: Professional Fee Application(s) (Text entry; no document attached.)
168
04/10/2019
~Notice of Hearing of Trustee's Final Report and Applications for Compensation
169
04/14/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Final Meeting of Creditors
170
04/14/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice/Order
05/09/2019
zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Document BK & AP) (Text entry; no document attached.)
171
05/16/2019
Compensation

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.