A B Tiffee, IV and Elisa Sara Tiffee
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Eastern District of Texas (Bankruptcy)

4:2018-bk-41836 (txeb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/20/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
2
08/20/2018
Notice of Appearance
5
08/22/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling
6
08/22/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling
11
09/01/2018
Certificate of Mailing
14
09/13/2018
Certificate of Mailing
16
09/19/2018
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
09/20/2018
Notice of Missing Documents to Individual Debtor (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
09/22/2018
Certificate of Mailing
19
10/12/2018
Employ
20
10/14/2018
Certificate of Mailing
22
10/22/2018
Operating Report
23
10/22/2018
Operating Report
25
11/16/2018
Order on Motion for the Approval of Chapter 11 Agreed Scheduling Order
26
11/18/2018
Certificate of Mailing
29
12/13/2018
Extend Time - Filing Complaint to Determine Dischargeability (by Creditor/Trustee)
30
12/15/2018
Certificate of Mailing
31
12/19/2018
Certificate of Service
32
12/20/2018
Notice of Appearance
33
12/26/2018
Operating Report
34
01/24/2019
Operating Report
35
02/12/2019
Extend Time - File Complaint to Determine Dischargeability (by Creditor/Trustee) (21)
36
02/21/2019
Operating Report
37
03/18/2019
Extend Time - Filing Complaint to Determine Dischargeability (by Creditor/Trustee)
38
03/20/2019
Certificate of Mailing
39
03/26/2019
Operating Report
40
03/29/2019
Generic Motion
41
04/12/2019
Extend Time - File Complaint to Determine Dischargeability (by Creditor/Trustee) (21)
42
04/18/2019
Objection
43
04/22/2019
Hearing Set - With Form

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.