A Base ix co. v. s and j Apparel, Inc. et al
Court Docket Sheet

Central District of California

2:2017-cv-03920 (cacd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 571 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
2
05/24/2017
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff A Base IX Co.
3
05/24/2017
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by plaintiff A Base IX Co.
4
05/24/2017
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff A Base IX Co., identifying Albert Gammal, David Apperman, Salomon Murciano.
5
05/25/2017
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge S. James Otero and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (jtil)
6
05/25/2017
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
7
05/25/2017
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons 3. The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jtil)
49
06/14/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
50
08/28/2018
Mediation Report (ADR-3) Completely Settled
52
10/12/2018
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
53
10/12/2018
Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.