A Better House, Inc.
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Middle District of Tennessee (Bankruptcy)

3:2014-bk-03259 (tnmb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
152
07/24/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Interim Report
153
07/25/2018
Clerk's Remark - Name and Case
154
07/25/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Interim Report
155
10/02/2018
Compensation - Motion
156
10/02/2018
Compensation - Motion
157
10/24/2018
Submitted Order
158
10/24/2018
Submitted Order
159
10/29/2018
Compensation - Order
160
10/29/2018
Compensation - Order
161
11/01/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
162
11/01/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.