A Better Today Recovery Services, LLC v. GRAY, JR. et al
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Arizona (Bankruptcy)

4:2018-ap-00297 (azb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/30/2018
Complaint
07/30/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/30/2018
Request for Issuance of Summons (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
07/30/2018
Notice of Filing
4
07/31/2018
Summons Issued (Form)
5
08/02/2018
Certificate of Service
6
12/31/2018
Stipulation
7
01/02/2019
Deficiency Memo (QC Form)
8
01/02/2019
Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)
9
01/10/2019
Notice of Hearing (Adversary) - VAN Form
10
01/12/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
11
02/06/2019
Order
12
02/07/2019
Minute Entry
13
03/11/2019
Stipulation
14
03/11/2019
Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)
15
03/12/2019
Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)
16
03/12/2019
Deficiency Memo (QC Form)
17
03/12/2019
Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)
18
03/12/2019
oContinuing/Rescheduling
19
03/13/2019
Minute Entry
20
03/14/2019
Order
21
04/17/2019
Order
22
04/18/2019
Minute Entry

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.