A C RICHARDSON
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Middle District of Tennessee (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-03258 (tnmb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/19/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
05/19/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
06/04/2018
Certificate of Completion of Financial Management Course (Debtor Only)
06/19/2018
Meeting of Creditors Held (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
06/20/2018
Reaffirmation Agreement (No Hearing Requested)
14
06/21/2018
Reaffirmation Agreement (No Hearing Requested)
06/27/2018
Statement of No Presumed Abuse (batch) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/11/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
08/20/2018
Discharge (Standard) - BK Order (SA)
18
08/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.