A C Smith and Yoshimi Kobayashi Miyazaki
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of California (Bankruptcy)

5:2018-bk-52127 (canb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
09/20/2018
Chapter 13 Bankruptcy Petition of A c Smith and Yoshimi Kobayashi Miyazaki
11
10/06/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
12
10/06/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Plan
16
11/15/2018
Certificate of Service
18
11/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing
19
11/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing
21
12/11/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
22
02/20/2019
Dismiss Case
23
02/20/2019
Opportunity for Hearing
24
02/26/2019
Declaration
25
02/26/2019
Ch 13 SJ Contested Notice of Hearing
26
02/26/2019
Certificate of Service
27
02/26/2019
Pre-Hearing Statement
28
02/26/2019
Request for Hearing
29
02/27/2019
Certificate of Service
30
03/06/2019
Relief from Stay
03/06/2019
none (Text entry; no document attached.)
31
03/06/2019
Notice of Hearing
doc
03/08/2019
Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges
33
03/11/2019
Trustee's Statement of Resolution
34
03/11/2019
Withdrawal of Document
38
03/21/2019
Compensation
03/21/2019
Confirmation Hearing Held (Text entry; no document attached.)
39
03/25/2019
Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (batch)
40
03/25/2019
Compensation
41
03/28/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Electronic Order
43
04/04/2019
Continue Hearing

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.