A&C Trade Consultants, Inc. v. Alvarez, et al.
Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of California

3:2018-cv-05356 (cand)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
5
08/31/2018
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
6
08/31/2018
Summons Issued
7
09/13/2018
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
09/14/2018
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
09/17/2018
Order Reassigning Case
10
09/20/2018
Case Management Scheduling Order
11
09/25/2018
Order
12
11/21/2018
Ex Parte Application
13
11/21/2018
Declaration in Support
14
11/21/2018
Declaration in Support
15
11/21/2018
Certificate/Proof of Service
16
11/21/2018
Certificate/Proof of Service
17
11/21/2018
Certificate/Proof of Service
11/21/2018
Electronic Filing Error (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2018
Set Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.