A C Westry, Jr.
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Southern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

1:2018-bk-04633 (alsb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
15
12/26/2018
Notice of Mortgage Payment Changes (also includes HELOC)
19
02/04/2019
Financial Management Course Due (ADI)
22
03/06/2019
Dismiss Case
23
03/06/2019
Notice of Hearing Set
25
03/08/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing (Auto)
26
03/11/2019
Notice of Withdrawal of Document

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.