A Calhoun Corp.
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Southern District of New York (Bankruptcy)

1:2019-bk-10558 (nysb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
02/22/2019
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
02/22/2019
Add Judge (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/22/2019
Repeat Filer (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/22/2019
Set Deficiency Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
03/01/2019
341(a) Notice (Chapter 11,12) (BNC)
4
03/03/2019
Certificate of Mailing PDF notice
5
03/04/2019
Certificate of Mailing - 341(a) Meeting
04/18/2019
Notice of Continuance of Meeting of Creditors (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
05/02/2019
Scheduling Order (Will Generate PDF Notice to BNC)
8
05/05/2019
Certificate of Mailing PDF notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.