A Chris Kneisler
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Eastern District of Wisconsin (Bankruptcy)

2:2013-bk-20909 (wieb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
06/03/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
86
06/29/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
96
08/17/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
101
09/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
103
10/03/2018
13 Trustee's Notice of Completion of Plan
105
10/06/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
109
11/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge
111
12/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.