A Chris Kneisler
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Eastern District of Wisconsin (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-31372 (wieb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
10
12/30/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
11
12/31/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
12
01/07/2019
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
15
01/18/2019
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
01/29/2019
Settlement Remark (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
02/06/2019
Proposed Order
18
02/07/2019
Order on Objection to Confirmation of Plan
21
02/10/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
22
02/10/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
27
02/18/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
28
02/19/2019
Mortgage Mediation - Certification of Readiness for Mediation

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.