A Christine Spriggs
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Central District of California (Bankruptcy)

2:2013-bk-36841 (cacb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
63
06/06/2018
Dismiss Case by Trustee (motion)
64
06/20/2018
Voluntary Dismissal of Motion
67
12/14/2018
Voluntary Dismissal of Motion
71
02/16/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
73
02/28/2019
Debtor's certification and application for entry of discharge - Chapter 13 (BNC)
02/28/2019
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document (Text entry; no document attached.)
75
03/08/2019
Debtor's certification and application for entry of discharge - Chapter 13 (BNC)
76
03/12/2019
Debtor's certification and application for entry of discharge - Chapter 13 (BNC)
77
03/14/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
78
03/18/2019
Notice of Change of Address
79
03/18/2019
Notice of Change of Address
80
03/20/2019
ORDER OF DISCHARGE - Chapter 13 (after completion of chapter 13 plan - cases filed after 11/05/90)
81
03/22/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
04/22/2019
Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.