A D Aldridge, Jr.
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Eastern District of Arkansas (Bankruptcy)

4:2016-bk-10277 (areb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
48
06/26/2018
Chapter 13 Plan
49
07/03/2018
Order to Pay Trustee
50
07/18/2018
Order Confirming Modified Chapter 13 Plan
51
07/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing
52
07/24/2018
Compensation - Ch. 13 ONLY
53
08/24/2018
Order on Compensation
54
08/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing
doc
11/26/2018
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.