A Dreamer
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Eastern District of California (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-25880 (caeb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
15
10/19/2018
Notice of No Distribution
17
11/03/2018
Personal Financial Management Course
19
01/04/2019
Discharge of Debtor - 7, 12, 13
20
01/06/2019
Discharge of Debtor - 7, 12, 13 (Certificate)
22
01/13/2019
Final Decree (Certificate)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.