A & E Flooring, Inc.
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of New Hampshire (Bankruptcy)

1:2015-bk-11670 (nhb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/23/2018
Final Report and Request for Commission (TFR - US Trustee use only)
doc
05/23/2018
Proposed Order
doc
05/23/2018
Final Fees
doc
05/23/2018
7 Trustee Hearing Notice and Summary of Final Report
doc
05/23/2018
Certificate of Service
52
07/16/2018
Final Fees
53
07/16/2018
Trustee Request for Commission
54
07/19/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
09/25/2018
Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
56
09/25/2018
Close Case
57
09/28/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (BK)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.