A & E Office Machines Inc et al v. Edge I & D et al
Court Docket Sheet

Western District of Louisiana

6:2018-cv-00895 (lawd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/10/2018
Complaint
07/10/2018
Divisional Transfer (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/10/2018
Case Assigned/Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
07/10/2018
Summons Issued - All (Form Included)
3
07/10/2018
Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)
4
07/11/2018
Corporate Disclosure Statement
10/29/2018
Minute Entry/Order Reassigning Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
11/08/2018
Answer to Complaint
7
11/08/2018
Notice of Deficiency
8
11/20/2018
Certificate of Service
9
11/30/2018
Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF)
10
12/06/2018
Order to Strike
11
12/13/2018
Entry of Default
12
12/13/2018
Clerks Entry of Default (Form Included)
13
12/21/2018
Notice of Intent to Dismiss (Form Included)
14
01/04/2019
Order Dismissing Case/Party (LR41.3)
15
01/24/2019
Default Judgment
16
01/24/2019
Default Judgment
17
01/24/2019
Default Judgment
18
01/25/2019
Corrective Document
19
01/25/2019
Corrective Document
20
02/19/2019
Default Judgment
03/06/2019
Motions Transferred (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
03/11/2019
Minute Entry/Order Setting Motion
22
03/28/2019
Motion Hearing
23
03/28/2019
Exhibit List
24
03/28/2019
Order on Motion for Default Judgment

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.