A & F Fire Protection Co., Inc. v. Liberty Insurance Underwriters, Inc. et al
Court Docket Sheet

Southern District of New York

1:2019-cv-00866 (nysd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/29/2019
Notice of Removal
01/30/2019
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/30/2019
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/30/2019
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/30/2019
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
01/30/2019
Notice of Removal
3
01/30/2019
Civil Cover Sheet
4
02/01/2019
Conference
5
02/04/2019
Order on Motion for Conference
6
02/04/2019
Conference
7
02/05/2019
Order on Motion for Conference
8
02/07/2019
Notice of Appearance
9
02/07/2019
Conference
10
02/07/2019
Notice of Appearance
11
02/08/2019
Order on Motion for Conference
12
02/12/2019
Order
13
02/20/2019
Amended Complaint
02/21/2019
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
02/21/2019
Amended Complaint
15
02/22/2019
Appear Pro Hac Vice
02/22/2019
Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
02/26/2019
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
17
03/26/2019
Dismiss
18
03/26/2019
Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
04/05/2019
Remark (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
04/10/2019
Notice of Appearance
20
04/22/2019
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
21
04/23/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.