A Greener Globe
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Eastern District of California (Bankruptcy)

2:2016-bk-21900 (caeb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/25/2018
Generic Motion/Application - Including Amended Motion
doc
05/25/2018
Declaration
doc
05/25/2018
Exhibit(s)
1
03/28/2016
Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Petition of A Greener Globe
doc
05/25/2018
Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments
417
12/12/2018
Status Report
418
12/12/2018
Exhibit(s)
419
12/12/2018
Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments
420
12/12/2018
Response/Reply
421
12/12/2018
Declaration
422
12/12/2018
Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments
423
12/12/2018
Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments
424
12/19/2018
Matter Continued *
425
12/19/2018
Matter Continued *
427
12/22/2018
BNC Service of Order (Certificate)
428
01/04/2019
Operating Report - Including Amendments
429
01/04/2019
Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments
442
02/11/2019
Operating Report - Including Amendments
443
02/11/2019
Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments
484
03/13/2019
Operating Report - Including Amendments
485
03/13/2019
Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments
496
03/18/2019
Generic Notice
497
03/18/2019
Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments
498
03/21/2019
Matter Continued *
499
03/21/2019
Matter Continued *
500
03/21/2019
Matter Continued *
501
03/21/2019
Matter Held *
502
03/21/2019
Matter Held *
503
03/21/2019
Matter Held *
507
03/22/2019
Exhibit(s)
508
03/22/2019
Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments
509
03/22/2019
Generic Order - Links to Non-Motion
510
03/24/2019
BNC Service of Order (Certificate)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.