A & H SPORTSWEAR CO., INC. v. PRE SHOP LLC et al
Court Docket Sheet

Eastern District of Pennsylvania

5:2017-cv-04210 (paed)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
7
06/04/2018
Order on Motion for Service
06/19/2018
Returned Mail (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
08/23/2018
Service
9
08/24/2018
Order on Motion for Service
10
09/05/2018
Affidavit of Service
11
09/05/2018
Affidavit of Service
12
09/05/2018
Affidavit of Service
09/24/2018
Returned Mail (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.