A Hand of Hope Pregnancy Resource Center v. City of Raleigh
Court Docket Sheet

Eastern District of North Carolina

5:2016-cv-00746 (nced)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
74
05/29/2018
Notice of Change of Address
05/29/2018
Notice to Counsel (Text entry; no document attached.)
75
06/07/2018
Notice of Appearance
76
06/07/2018
Notice of Appearance
77
06/21/2018
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
06/22/2018
Notice of Deficiency - Failure to File Proposed Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
78
06/22/2018
Proposed Order
06/22/2018
Motion Submitted (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/22/2018
Motion No Longer Submitted (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/22/2018
Motion Referred (Text entry; no document attached.)
79
06/22/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
80
07/05/2018
File Excess Pages
81
07/05/2018
Memorandum in Support
07/06/2018
Motion Submitted (Text entry; no document attached.)
82
07/09/2018
Order Setting/Resetting Hearings
07/10/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (Text entry; no document attached.)
83
07/27/2018
ORDER denying 25 Motion for Preliminary Injunction - The court finds that Hand of Hope has not made a clear showing of likelihood of success on the merits on its substantial burden claim, or any of its other claims. Therefore, a preliminary injunc tion is not warranted in this case. Granting in part and denying in part 46 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment - Summary judgment is GRANTED to the City with respect to Hand of Hopes free speech and equal protection claims. Hand of Hopes claim un der RLUIPAs equal terms and substantial burden provisions remain, along with its claims against the City for undue burden placed on a womans fundamental right to have access to information concerning pregnancy and undue burden on an unborn childs fundamental right to begin life with a sound mind and body. Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 7/27/2018. (Sellers, N.)
84
07/30/2018
Summary Judgment
85
07/30/2018
Statement of Material Facts
86
07/30/2018
Appendix to the Statement of Facts
87
07/30/2018
Memorandum in Support
07/30/2018
Reminder to Counsel - Judge Britt (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/30/2018
Reminder to Counsel - Judge Britt (Text entry; no document attached.)
88
08/15/2018
Extension of Time-Other
08/16/2018
Motion Referred (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/18/2018
Text Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/20/2018
Text Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/20/2018
Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
91
08/20/2018
Sealed Notice To Parties
92
09/04/2018
Memorandum in Opposition
93
09/04/2018
Response (non motion)
09/05/2018
Reminder to Counsel - Judge Britt (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/11/2018
Reminder to Counsel - Judge Britt (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/11/2018
Motion Submitted (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/11/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Text entry; no document attached.)
94
09/04/2018
Appendix to the Statement of Facts
96
09/19/2018
Leave to File Document
09/19/2018
Motion Referred (Text entry; no document attached.)
97
09/21/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to File
98
09/24/2018
Amended Complaint
99
09/25/2018
Statement of Material Facts
100
09/25/2018
Appendix to the Statement of Facts
09/26/2018
Motion Submitted (Text entry; no document attached.)
101
09/25/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
102
11/07/2018
Pretrial Conference - Interim
103
02/14/2019
Notice-other
02/14/2019
Remark (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.