A Helping Hand Too, LLC and Louisiana Department of Health & Hospitals
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Western District of Louisiana (Bankruptcy)

3:2017-bk-31512 (lawb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
156
06/25/2018
Sell Free and Clear of Liens 11 USC Sec 363(f) (Fee)
158
06/26/2018
Certificate of Service
171
07/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
174
08/11/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
175
08/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
184
09/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
199
10/19/2018
Certificate of Service
200
10/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
205
02/04/2019
Compensation/Administrative Expenses, TRUSTEE related ONLY
02/04/2019
Hearing Set - Motions (Definite Hearing) - JSH (Text entry; no document attached.)
206
02/04/2019
Limit Notice
207
02/04/2019
Certificate of Service
208
02/04/2019
Certificate of Service
209
02/05/2019
Limit Notice
210
02/08/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
211
02/20/2019
Miscellaneous Motion (Generic)
02/20/2019
Hearing Set - Motions (Definite Hearing) - JSH (Text entry; no document attached.)
212
02/20/2019
Miscellaneous Motion (Generic)
02/20/2019
Hearing Set - Motions (Definite Hearing) - JSH (Text entry; no document attached.)
214
03/01/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
216
04/02/2019
Miscellaneous Motion (Generic)
217
04/02/2019
Miscellaneous Motion (Generic)
218
04/05/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
219
04/05/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.