A J Brown v. Nancy A. Berryhill
Court Docket Sheet

Central District of California

5:2017-cv-02375 (cacd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
15
05/23/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
16
06/05/2018
Extension of Time to File
17
06/28/2018
Memorandum in Support of Motion
19
08/08/2018
Order
21
09/18/2018
Order
23
10/04/2018
Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
24
10/11/2018
Reply (Motion related)
26
01/09/2019
Stay Case
27
01/09/2019
Stay Case
31
03/14/2019
ORDER ACCEPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Judge David O. Carter for Report and Recommendation (Issued) 28. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Judgment be entered affirming thedecision of the Commissioner denying benefits, and dismissing this action withprejudice. (See document for details.) (sbou)
32
03/14/2019
JUDGMENT by Judge David O. Carter, in favor of Nancy A. Berryhill against A J Brown Related to: R&R - Accepting Report and Recommendations, 31. IT IS HEREBY ADJUDGED that the decision of the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration is AFFIRMED and this action is dismissed withprejudice. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (sbou)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.