A & J Produce Corp. v. Johnny Avocado, Inc. et al
Court Docket Sheet

Southern District of New York

1:2018-cv-00552 (nysd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
27
05/23/2018
Order
28
05/24/2018
Declaration in Support (non-motion)
29
05/24/2018
Certificate of Service Other
05/29/2018
Received Returned Mail (Text entry; no document attached.)
30
06/04/2018
Declaration (non-motion)
31
06/22/2018
Letter
32
11/29/2018
Order on Motion for Default Judgment

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.