A & J Transportation Inc et al v. C & J Energy Services Inc et al
Court Docket Sheet

Western District of Oklahoma

5:2018-cv-00450 (okwd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
3
05/21/2018
Entry of Appearance
4
05/21/2018
Entry of Appearance
5
05/21/2018
Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer
6
05/30/2018
Entry of Appearance
7
05/30/2018
Disclosure Statement - Corporate
8
06/05/2018
Disclosure Statement - Corporate
9
06/05/2018
Disclosure Statement - Corporate
10
06/18/2018
Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan
11
06/20/2018
Docket
12
08/03/2018
Consolidate Cases
13
08/06/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings
14
08/08/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
15
08/09/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
16
08/16/2018
Docket
17
08/17/2018
Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases
18
08/31/2018
Compel
19
09/21/2018
Response to Motion
20
09/25/2018
Entry of Appearance
09/28/2018
Notice from the Court (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
09/28/2018
Entry of Appearance
22
09/28/2018
Notice of Address Change
23
10/02/2018
Scheduling Order
24
10/04/2018
Order on Motion to Compel
25
10/24/2018
Add Party
26
11/01/2018
Return of Service - NON SUMMONS
27
11/14/2018
Compel
28
11/15/2018
Response to Motion
11/16/2018
Notice from the Court (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
11/16/2018
Response to Motion
30
11/16/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
11/20/2018
Notice from the Court (Text entry; no document attached.)
31
11/20/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
32
11/27/2018
Notice of Settlement
33
11/27/2018
Administrative Closing Order

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.