A Janelle McCord
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Southern District of Ohio (Bankruptcy)

1:2014-bk-11724 (ohsb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
47
07/06/2018
Personal Financial Management Course Certificate
48
07/20/2018
Financial Management Course
49
07/20/2018
Debtor's Certification Regarding Issuance of Discharge Order
50
07/21/2018
Chapter 13 Trustee's Certification of Final Payment and Case History
51
08/21/2018
Discharging Debtor(s)
52
08/24/2018
Certificate of Mailing - BNC
53
09/24/2018
Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report
10/25/2018
Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.