A Jean McCabe
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Middle District of Florida (Bankruptcy)

9:2018-bk-09022 (flmb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/22/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
10/22/2018
Statement of Social Security Numbers (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
10/22/2018
Certificate Of Credit Counseling
10/23/2018
Prior Bankruptcy Case(s) (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
10/23/2018
341 Mtg. Notice - Ch 7 Indiv. No Asset
10/23/2018
(NO PAPER) - 521 Compliance Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/27/2018
(NO PAPER) - Report of No Distribution - Ch 7 - No Funds (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
01/31/2019
Discharge Of Debtor - Ch. 7 - TAMPA/ORLANDO/JAX
9
02/03/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.