A & K Energy Conservation, Inc. v. PNC Bank, National Association et al
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Middle District of Florida (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-ap-00186 (flmb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/24/2018
Notice Of Pretrial / Status Conference
doc
05/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Notice
doc
05/29/2018
Proof of Service
18
07/02/2018
Disclosure
19
07/03/2018
Disclosure
20
07/09/2018
Z - Generic Motion (use only when there is no specific motion event)
21
07/10/2018
Proof of Service
07/10/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
07/16/2018
Response - Other than Motions
25
07/17/2018
CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held
26
07/30/2018
Generic Order
27
07/30/2018
Proof of Service

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.