A & K Energy Conservation, Inc.
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Middle District of Florida (Bankruptcy)

8:2017-bk-03318 (flmb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
375
06/14/2018
Certificate Of Service
376
06/20/2018
Financial Reports - Chapter 11
378
07/03/2018
Z - Generic Motion (use only when there is no specific motion event)
07/06/2018
Prepare Hearing Notice - Automation Use Only (Text entry; no document attached.)
379
07/06/2018
Notice Of Change of Address - Party
383
07/09/2018
Proof of Service
387
07/17/2018
CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held
07/18/2018
Withdrawn/Ruled on in Open Court (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/18/2018
Ore Tenus Motion (court use only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
390
07/18/2018
Ore Tenus Motion
391
07/19/2018
Financial Reports - Chapter 11
392
07/24/2018
Notice Of Selection of Mediator
394
08/17/2018
Financial Reports - Chapter 11
396
09/13/2018
Financial Reports - Chapter 11
397
09/14/2018
Motion to Approve Compromise of Controversy or Settlement Agreement
398
09/18/2018
Motion to Assume or Reject Lease/Executory Contract
399
09/19/2018
Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing
09/19/2018
Prepare Hearing Notice - Automation Use Only (Text entry; no document attached.)
402
09/20/2018
Order (Generic)
403
09/21/2018
Proof of Service
404
09/25/2018
Reschedule Hearing
405
09/26/2018
Proof of Service
406
10/05/2018
Motion to Assume or Reject Lease/Executory Contract
407
10/05/2018
Motion to Assume or Reject Lease/Executory Contract
408
10/05/2018
Motion to Assume or Reject Lease/Executory Contract
10/09/2018
Prepare Hearing Notice - Automation Use Only (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/09/2018
Prepare Hearing Notice - Automation Use Only (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/09/2018
Prepare Hearing Notice - Automation Use Only (Text entry; no document attached.)
414
10/12/2018
Reschedule Hearing
415
10/12/2018
Approve Compromise or Settlement
416
10/12/2018
Proof of Service
417
10/12/2018
Proof of Service
418
10/19/2018
Application for Compensation (incl. Quantum Meruit)
419
10/22/2018
Financial Reports - Chapter 11
11/01/2018
Close Adversary Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
420
11/02/2018
CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held
421
11/02/2018
Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing
11/05/2018
Accompanying Orders List Proposed Order Submission Reminder (Text entry; no document attached.)
426
11/14/2018
Order (Generic)
427
11/14/2018
Proof of Service
428
11/14/2018
Proof of Service
433
11/16/2018
Compensation
437
11/20/2018
Financial Reports - Chapter 11
439
11/21/2018
Proof of Service
440
11/28/2018
Proof of Service
444
12/05/2018
Compensation
447
12/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order
450
12/12/2018
Generic Order
451
12/13/2018
Sell
452
12/13/2018
Proof of Service
453
12/13/2018
Proof of Service
454
12/14/2018
Approve Compromise or Settlement
455
12/14/2018
Proof of Service
456
12/14/2018
Sell
457
12/17/2018
Proof of Service
458
12/17/2018
Proof of Service
461
12/20/2018
Financial Reports - Chapter 11
462
12/20/2018
Order Conditionally Approving Disclosure Statement
463
12/20/2018
Assume/Reject
464
12/21/2018
Proof of Service
465
12/21/2018
CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held
466
12/21/2018
Proof of Service
467
12/31/2018
SCHEDULES (original schedules, individual schedules or amended schedules)
468
01/02/2019
Motion to Approve Compromise of Controversy or Settlement Agreement
469
01/03/2019
Motion to Assume or Reject Lease/Executory Contract
470
01/04/2019
Application for Compensation (incl. Quantum Meruit)
471
01/04/2019
Assume/Reject
472
01/04/2019
Application for Compensation (incl. Quantum Meruit)
01/04/2019
Prepare Hearing Notice - Automation Use Only (Text entry; no document attached.)
474
01/04/2019
Compensation
475
01/07/2019
Proof of Service
476
01/07/2019
Proof of Service
01/09/2019
ADI Reminder to Prepare and Serve Notice of Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
478
01/10/2019
Notice Of Change of Address - Party
482
01/21/2019
Financial Reports - Chapter 11
484
01/22/2019
Confirmation Affidavit
485
01/24/2019
Order (Generic)
486
01/24/2019
Proof of Service
487
01/25/2019
CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held
488
02/01/2019
Application for Compensation (incl. Quantum Meruit)
489
02/01/2019
Administrative Expenses
490
02/01/2019
Administrative Expenses
491
02/04/2019
Compensation
492
02/04/2019
Proof of Service
493
02/04/2019
Administrative Expenses
494
02/04/2019
Approve Compromise or Settlement
495
02/05/2019
Assume/Reject
496
02/05/2019
Generic Order
497
02/05/2019
Proof of Service
498
02/05/2019
Proof of Service
499
02/06/2019
Proof of Service
500
02/06/2019
Proof of Service
501
02/06/2019
Proof of Service
502
02/07/2019
Assume/Reject
503
02/07/2019
Proof of Service
504
02/07/2019
Proof of Service
505
02/15/2019
Application for Compensation (incl. Quantum Meruit)
506
02/15/2019
Compensation
507
02/18/2019
Proof of Service

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.