A Laughing Frog LLC
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of New Mexico (Bankruptcy)

1:2017-bk-12887 (nmb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/18/2018
Operating Report
doc
05/23/2018
Valuation (Order)
doc
05/23/2018
Valuation (Order)
doc
05/23/2018
Objection to Claim
doc
05/23/2018
Deadline to File Responses to Obj to Claim (Notice)
doc
06/04/2018
Stipulated Order
74
06/04/2018
Witness List
75
06/04/2018
Exhibit List
76
06/04/2018
Objection to Confirmation of Plan
77
06/04/2018
Objection
78
06/04/2018
Objection to Confirmation of Plan
79
06/04/2018
Objection
80
06/05/2018
Extend/ShortenTime (Motion)
81
06/05/2018
Objection to Confirmation of Plan
82
06/05/2018
Witness List
83
06/06/2018
Generic (Order)
84
06/07/2018
Compel (Motion)
85
06/08/2018
Witness List
86
06/08/2018
Exhibit List
87
06/08/2018
Objection
88
06/08/2018
Objection to Confirmation of Plan
89
06/08/2018
Objection to Confirmation of Plan
90
06/08/2018
Exhibit List
91
06/08/2018
Witness List
92
06/12/2018
Extend/ShortenTime (Motion)
94
06/19/2018
Response
95
06/19/2018
Operating Report
06/20/2018
Hearing Set (Text entry; no document attached.)
96
06/21/2018
Hearing (Notice) - BNC Notice with select recipients
97
06/27/2018
Request for Notice
98
06/28/2018
Response
100
07/09/2018
Stipulated Order
102
07/17/2018
Employ (Application)
103
07/17/2018
Disclosure of Compensation
104
07/17/2018
Deadline to File Objections (Notice)
105
07/19/2018
Hearing (Notice) - BNC Notice with select recipients
106
07/23/2018
Withdrawal of Document
107
07/24/2018
Generic Document
109
08/07/2018
Operating Report
110
08/21/2018
Stipulation
111
08/22/2018
Generic Document
08/22/2018
Notice of Error (Text entry; no document attached.)
120
08/28/2018
Approval (Motion)
121
08/28/2018
Deadline to File Objections (Notice)
08/29/2018
Notice of Error (Text entry; no document attached.)
122
08/29/2018
Exhibits
125
09/12/2018
Objection
127
09/19/2018
Objection
128
09/20/2018
Employ (Order on Application)
130
09/27/2018
Extend/Shorten Time (Order)
131
09/27/2018
Conditionally Approving Disclosure Statement (Order)
135
10/12/2018
Deadline to File Objections (Notice)
136
10/15/2018
Operating Report
137
10/15/2018
Operating Report
138
10/22/2018
Deadline to File Objections (Notice)
143
10/25/2018
Objection to Confirmation of Plan
144
10/25/2018
Statement
10/26/2018
Notice of Error (Text entry; no document attached.)
145
10/26/2018
Withdrawal of Document
146
10/26/2018
Change of Address
148
10/26/2018
Witness List
149
10/26/2018
Exhibit List
153
10/30/2018
Tally of Ballots
154
10/30/2018
Dismiss Case for other reasons (Motion)
155
10/30/2018
Statement
156
10/30/2018
Hearing (Notice)
157
10/31/2018
Minutes of Hearing
158
11/09/2018
Extend/Shorten Time (Order)
159
11/21/2018
Response
160
11/26/2018
Operating Report
163
11/27/2018
Extend/Shorten Time (Order)
164
11/27/2018
Scheduling Order

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.