A Milo Allas Roderos and Shirley Asuncion D Roderos
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Central District of California (Bankruptcy)

2:2017-bk-15297 (cacb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
43
06/18/2018
Notice of Change of Address
44
07/31/2018
Relief - Personal Property (motion)
07/31/2018
Hearing Set(Motion) (Text entry; no document attached.)
46
08/28/2018
Stipulation (motion)
47
08/28/2018
Notice of Lodgment
08/28/2018
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document (Text entry; no document attached.)
49
08/28/2018
Stipulation (motion)
50
08/28/2018
Notice of Lodgment
51
08/29/2018
Relief from stay - PERSONAL PROPERTY (BNC-PDF)
52
08/31/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.