A Moore's Services Inc
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Kansas (Bankruptcy)

2:2017-bk-20834 (ksb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
29
02/06/2019
Employ
30
02/07/2019
Employ
31
02/09/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
32
04/01/2019
Praecipe/Request
33
04/02/2019
Notice of Closing Information
34
04/09/2019
Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Report (UST Filed)
04/09/2019
Update Other Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.