A P Lenard L L C v. Befesa Industrial Services USA Inc
Court Docket Sheet

Western District of Louisiana

3:2017-cv-00958 (lawd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
33
05/21/2018
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
34
06/22/2018
Order to Show Cause
35
06/28/2018
Extension of Time to Amend
36
06/29/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend
06/29/2018
Set/Reset Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
37
06/29/2018
Extension (Other)
38
07/01/2018
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
07/03/2018
Order on Motion for Extension (Other) (Text entry; no document attached.)
40
07/25/2018
Report and Recommendations
41
08/07/2018
Notice of Appearance
42
08/07/2018
Objection to Report and Recommendations
43
08/08/2018
Order on Report and Recommendations
44
08/09/2018
Vacate
08/10/2018
Motions Transferred (Text entry; no document attached.)
45
08/13/2018
Order on Motion to Vacate
46
08/13/2018
Scheduling Order - Doughty/James
47
11/05/2018
Withdraw as Attorney
48
11/07/2018
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
49
12/17/2018
Order to Show Cause

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.