A & P Sales, LLC
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Eastern District of Washington (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-00262 (waeb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
02/02/2018
Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Petition of A & p Sales, LLC
9
10/29/2018
Claim - Notice Setting Time for Filing Proof of Claim (form)
10
10/29/2018
Notice to Trustee Regarding Deferred Fees
12
10/31/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing
13
04/17/2019
Examination Under 2004
14
04/17/2019
Received Unsigned Order
15
04/18/2019
Examination

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.