A P Vending and Amusement Co., Inc
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Massachusetts (Bankruptcy)

1:2018-bk-13970 (mab)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/23/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
2
10/23/2018
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
3
10/23/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing
4
10/23/2018
Employ
5
10/23/2018
Schedules (Original)
6
10/24/2018
Order to Update
12
10/25/2018
Order To Set Hearing
13
10/25/2018
Order To Set Hearing
14
10/25/2018
Response
48
11/09/2018
Order
59
12/06/2018
Order To Set Hearing
60
12/06/2018
Order
77
12/10/2018
Order on Application to Employ
79
12/11/2018
Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing
83
12/13/2018
Court's Order of Deficiency

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.