A Paige Nix
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Western District of Arkansas (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-73022 (arwb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
11/09/2018
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition (fee) - case upload
11/09/2018
none (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/10/2018
Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset) (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
11/15/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
5
12/10/2018
Financial Management Course (Form 423) - Debtor Education
6
12/14/2018
Amended Petition, Schs, Stmts or Creditors (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)
12/14/2018
none (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.