A Pierre Marchand Jr Living Trust v. F/V Emerald Sea et al
Court Docket Sheet

Western District of Washington

3:2018-cv-05610 (wawd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/01/2018
Complaint
2
08/01/2018
Arrest of Vessel
3
08/01/2018
Proposed Order (Unsigned)
08/01/2018
Add and Terminate Judges (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
08/01/2018
Summons Issued
5
08/13/2018
Amended Complaint
6
08/13/2018
Praecipe for a Summons
7
08/29/2018
Summons Issued
8
08/30/2018
Order on Motion to Arrest Vessel
9
09/13/2018
Summons Returned Unexecuted
10
10/08/2018
Summons Returned Executed
11
10/08/2018
Notice of Appearance
12
10/17/2018
Answer to Amended Complaint
10/18/2018
Notice re Lack of Proper Signature (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
10/18/2018
Praecipe to Attach Document
14
10/25/2018
BHS - Discovery, Depositions, and JSR Order (FORM)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.