A Quiver Full, Inc.
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Georgia (Bankruptcy)

1:2016-bk-66793 (ganb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 726 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
09/23/2016
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) for Non-Individual Fee $ 1717, Filed by William A. Rountree of Macey, Wilensky & Hennings LLC on behalf of A Quiver Full, Inc. Chapter 11 Plan due by 1/23/2017. Disclosure Statement due by 1/23/2017.
2
09/23/2016
Receipt of Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(16-66793) [misc,4002aty] (1717.00) filing fee. Receipt Number 42861905. Fee Amount 1717.00 (re: Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury)
3
09/26/2016
Notice of deadlines to correct filing deficiencies - Non-Individual. Service by BNC. Statement of Financial Affairs due 10/7/2016. Schedule(s) due by 10/7/2016. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury due by 10/7/2016. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 10/7/2016. Atty Disclosure State. due 10/7/2016. Corporate Resolution due 10/7/2016. List of Equity Security Holders due 10/7/2016.
4
09/28/2016
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice of Deficiency Notice Date 09/28/2016.
5
09/29/2016
Notice of Appearance Filed by James H. Morawetz on behalf of Office of the United States Trustee.
6
09/29/2016
Notice of Appearance Filed by Will B. Geer on behalf of Michael L. Werner.
7
09/29/2016
Motion to Authorize Use of Existing Bank Accounts filed by William A. Rountree on behalf of A Quiver Full, Inc.
8
09/29/2016
Certificate of Service filed by Will B. Geer on behalf of Michael L. Werner. (related document(s) 6 Notice of Appearance)
9
09/29/2016
Application to Employ Macey, Wilensky & Hennings, LLC as attorneys filed by William A. Rountree on behalf of A Quiver Full, Inc.
10
09/29/2016
Motion to Approve Use of Cash Collateral filed by William A. Rountree on behalf of A Quiver Full, Inc.
11
09/29/2016
Motion for expedited hearing on First Day Motions filed by William A. Rountree on behalf of A Quiver Full, Inc. Modified on 9/30/2016
12
09/30/2016
Order and Notice Scheduling Emergency Hearing. Hearing to be held on 10/6/2016 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 1403, Atlanta. To be served by Counsel for Debtor. Entered on 9/30/2016. (related document(s) 7 Authorize Use of Existing Bank Accounts, Motion to filed by A Quiver Full, Inc., 9 Application to Employ filed by A Quiver Full, Inc., 10 Motion to Approve Use of Cash Collateral filed by A Quiver Full, Inc.)
13
09/30/2016
Notice of Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 11). 341 Meeting to be held on 10/26/2016 at 11:00 AM in Hearing Room 367, Atlanta.
14
09/30/2016
Certificate of Service Order and Notice Scheduling Emergency Hearing, Motion for Expedited Hearings, Application to Approve Employment of Attorneys, Limited Motion to Keep Bank Accounts Open, and Motion for Authority to Use Cash Collateral filed by William A. Rountree on behalf of A Quiver Full, Inc. (related document(s) 12 Order and Notice)
15
10/02/2016
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice of Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 10/02/2016.
16
10/02/2016
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order and Notice Notice Date 10/02/2016.
17
10/04/2016
Motion For Extension Of Time For Filing Schedules And Statement Of Financial Affairs filed by William A. Rountree on behalf of A Quiver Full, Inc. Modified on 10/5/2016
18
10/05/2016
Order GRANTING Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules through and including October 19, 2016. (Related Doc # 17) Service by BNC. Entered on 10/5/2016. Schedule(s) due by 10/19/2016
10/07/2016
COURT NOTES: FINAL Hearing to be held on 11/3/2016 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 1403, Atlanta, (related document(s) 10 Motion to Approve Use of Cash Collateral filed by A Quiver Full, Inc.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
10/07/2016
Order Approving Debtor's Limited Motion to Keep Bank Accounts Open. (Related Doc # 7) Service by BNC. Entered on 10/7/2016.
20
10/07/2016
Interim Consent Order Authorizing Debtor To Use Cash Collateral and Notice Of Final Hearing On Motion For Use Of Cash Collateral. Hearing to be held on 11/3/2016 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 1403, Atlanta. Service by BNC. Entered on 10/7/2016. (related document(s) 10 Motion to Approve Use of Cash Collateral filed by A Quiver Full, Inc.)
21
10/07/2016
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Application to Extend Time to File Schedules Notice Date 10/07/2016.
22
10/09/2016
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion to Authorize Use of Existing Bank Accounts Notice Date 10/09/2016.
23
10/09/2016
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Notice Date 10/09/2016.
24
10/12/2016
Order Approving Employment Of Attorneys For Debtor. (Related Doc # 9). Service by BNC. Entered on 10/12/2016.
25
10/14/2016
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Application to Employ Notice Date 10/14/2016.
26
10/18/2016
Corporate Ownership Statement, Verification or Declaration for Individual Debtor, List of Equity Security Holders, Schedule A/B, Schedule D, Schedule E/F, Schedule G, Schedule H, Statement of Financial Affairs, Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individual Debtor, Attorney Disclosure Statement filed by William A. Rountree on behalf of A Quiver Full, Inc. (related document(s) 3 Notice of Deadlines to Correct New Case Deficiency) Modified on 10/19/2016
10/24/2016
DOCKETED FOR CALENDARING PURPOSES ONLY. Final Hearing to be held on 11/3/2016 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 1403, Atlanta, (related document(s) 10 Motion to Approve Use of Cash Collateral filed by A Quiver Full, Inc., 20 01-Order) (Text entry; no document attached.)
27
10/25/2016
Operating Report for the period of September 23, 2016 through September 30, 2016 filed by William A. Rountree on behalf of A Quiver Full, Inc.
10/26/2016
Section 341(a) meeting held and concluded (Text entry; no document attached.)
28
11/02/2016
Order and Notice Continuing Authorization To Use Cash Collateral Through November 17, 2016 And Rescheduling Final Cash Collateral Hearing. Continued Hearing to be held on 11/17/2016 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 1403, Atlanta. To be served by Counsel for Debtor. Entered on 11/2/2016. (related document(s) 10 Motion to Approve Use of Cash Collateral filed by A Quiver Full, Inc.)
29
11/02/2016
Certificate of Service of Order and Notice Continuing Authorization to Use Cash Collateral through November 17, 2016 and Rescheduling Final Cash Collateral Hearing filed by William A. Rountree on behalf of A Quiver Full, Inc. (related document(s) 28 Order and Notice)
30
11/04/2016
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order and Notice Notice Date 11/04/2016.
31
11/08/2016
Amended Operating Report for the period of September 23, 2016 through September 30, 2016 filed by William A. Rountree on behalf of A Quiver Full, Inc. (related document(s) 27 Operating Report)
32
11/17/2016
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtor (Amended) filed by William A. Rountree on behalf of A Quiver Full, Inc. (related document(s) 26 Corporate Ownership Statement, Declaration of Debtor, Equity Security Holders, Schedules A/B, Schedule D - Creditors Holding Secured Claims, Schedule E/F Creditors who have unsecured claims, Schedule G - Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases, Schedule H - CoDebtors, Statement of Financial Affairs, Summary of Assets and Liabilities, Attorney Disclosure Statement)
33
11/21/2016
Second Interim Consent Order Authorizing Debtor To Use Cash Collateral; And Notice Of Reassignment Of Final Hearing On Motion For Use Of Cash Collateral. Hearing to be held on 12/8/2016 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 1403, Atlanta. Service by BNC. Entered on 11/21/2016. (related document(s) 10 Motion to Approve Use of Cash Collateral filed by A Quiver Full, Inc.)
34
11/22/2016
Certificate of Service of the Second Interim Consent Order Authorizing Debtor to Use Cash Collateral and Notice of Reassignment of Final Hearing on Motion for Use of Cash Collateral filed by William A. Rountree on behalf of A Quiver Full, Inc. (related document(s) 10 Motion to Approve Use of Cash Collateral)
35
11/22/2016
Operating Report for the period of October 1, 2016 through October 31, 2016 filed by William A. Rountree on behalf of A Quiver Full, Inc.
36
11/23/2016
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Notice Date 11/23/2016.
37
11/28/2016
Motion to Extend/Limit Exclusivity Period for Filing Chapter 11 Plan and Disclosure Statement filed by William A. Rountree on behalf of A Quiver Full, Inc. Hearing to be held on 1/5/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 1403, Atlanta

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.